+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 400.
On November 2, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On October 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On August 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On August 4, 1999 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 376 - 43 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On August 3, 1999 in the House:
- Committee on Government Reform discharged.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 106-287 , Part I.
- Referred sequentially to the House Committee on Government Reform for a period ending not later than Aug. 3, 1999 for consideration of such provisions of the bill and amendment as fall within the jurisdiction of that committee pursuant to clause 1, rule X.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 172.
- Mr. Coble moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1907 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
On May 26, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 24, 1999 in the House:
- Original bill introduced in form agreed upon by the Subcommittee on Courts and Intellectual Property on May 20, 1999.
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor