+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On August 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 112-158.
- Signed by President.
On August 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On August 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to House amendment to Senate amendment by Voice Vote.
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
- House agreed to Senate amendment with amendment pursuant to H.Res. 750 .
On May 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.2123 Amendment SA 2123 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.2124 Amendment SA 2124 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.2124 Amendment SA 2124 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Johnson SD to Amendment SA 2123. To improve the bill.
- S.AMDT.2123 Amendment SA 2123 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Johnson SD. In the nature of a substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On December 14, 2011 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 410 - 11 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On December 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On December 13, 2011 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1905 .
- Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
On November 2, 2011 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
On June 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and Procurement Reform .
On May 31, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
- Referred to House Financial Services
- Referred to House Foreign Affairs
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Amendments (2)
S.AMDT.2123
In the nature of a substitute.
S.AMDT.2124
To improve the bill.
+ − Sponsors (364)
Type:
Primary Sponsor