+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On October 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 718.
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain without amendment. With written report No. 105-412 .
On October 1, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On September 16, 1997 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Condit objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 3, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 139.
- Reported by the Committee on Science. H. Rept. 105-243 .
On July 29, 1997 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 28, 1997 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 23, 1997 in the House:
- Hearing Held by the Subcommittee on Technology Prior to Referral .
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology.
On June 17, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor