+ − Summary
+ − Actions (6)
On March 12, 1992 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received from ITC.
On February 26, 1992 in the House:
- See H.R.4318 .
On November 21, 1991 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received from Commerce.
On May 10, 1991 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Treasury, Commerce, ITC, USTR.
On April 23, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
On April 17, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor