+ − Summary
+ − Actions (6)
On August 20, 1990 in the House:
- See H.R.1594 .
On July 24, 1989 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received from ITC.
On June 16, 1989 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received from USTR.
On May 12, 1989 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State, Treasury, Commerce, Labor, ITC, and USTR.
On May 2, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
On April 13, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor