+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On December 20, 1979 in the House:
- Private Law 96-23.
- Signed by President.
On December 14, 1979 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On December 11, 1979 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On December 11, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On December 5, 1979 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 96-457.
On November 28, 1979 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On November 27, 1979 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
On November 16, 1979 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, H. Rept. 96-642.
On February 5, 1979 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor