+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (87)
Type:
Primary Sponsor