+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 19, 1996 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 104-310.
- Signed by President.
On October 10, 1996 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 4, 1996 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 3, 1996 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 3, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Agriculture discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On August 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.
On July 31, 1995 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 104-216 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 112.
- Mr. Emerson asked unanimous consent to consider.
- H.AMDT.700 Amendment in the nature of a substitute offered by the Committee on Agriculture. See pages H8306-H8307 in the Congressional Record of August 2, 1995 for a complete record of House consideration of H.R. 1874 .
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- H.AMDT.700 On agreeing to the Agriculture amendment Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 18, 1995 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Resource Conservation, Research and Forestry Discharged.
On July 13, 1995 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held. Hearings Printed: H. Hrg. 104-18.
On June 22, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Resource Conservation, Research and Forestry.
On June 16, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.700
See pages H8306-H8307 in the Congressional Record of August 2, 1995 for a complete record of House consideration of
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor