+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On December 19, 2018 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 115-330.
- Signed by President.
On December 13, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7453)
On November 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 701.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. Without written report.
On November 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On September 25, 2018 in the House:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8849-8850)
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1872.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8849-8853)
- Mr. Rutherford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 25, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3005-3006)
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor