+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 11, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 492.
- Committee on Rules discharged.
On September 12, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 11, 2014.
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 12, 2014.
- Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Budget. H. Rept. 113-382, Part I.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 10.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
- Referred to House Rules
- Referred to House Budget
- Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (143)
Type:
Primary Sponsor