+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (58)
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 115-164. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- S.Amdt.2213 Amendment SA 2213 ruled out of order by the chair.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 2. Record Vote Number: 60.
- S.Amdt.2212 Proposed amendment SA 2212 withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S1871)
- S.Amdt.2213 Point of order that the amendement violates section 4106(a) of H.Con.Res. 71, 115th Congress, raised in Senate with respect to amendment SA 2213.
- S.Amdt.2213 Motion to waive all applicable budgetary discipline with respect to amendment SA 2213 rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 21 - 78. Record Vote Number: 59.
- S.Amdt.2213 Amendment SA 2213 proposed by Senator Wyden. (consideration: CR S1865-1871; text: CR S1865) To provide additional funding to the Department of Justice to combat the online facilitation of sex trafficking.
- S.Amdt.2212 Amendment SA 2212 proposed by Senator Wyden. (consideration: CR S1865-1871; text: CR S1865) To clarify that efforts of a provider or user of an interactive computer service to identify, restrict access to, or remove objectionable material shall not be considered in determining the criminal or civil liability of the provider or user for other material.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1849-1872)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S1801)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate vitiated previous cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1780-1784)
- Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 94 - 2. Record Vote Number: 57. (CR S1780)
- Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S1773)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S1742)
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S1731)
- Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 339.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- UNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was the question on adoption of an amendment which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed.
- On motion that the Committee rise Agreed to by voice vote.
- Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H.R. 1865 as unfinished business.
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1317-1319)
- On passage Passed by recorded vote: 388 - 25 (Roll no. 91).
- H.Amdt.526 On agreeing to the Walters, Mimi amendment (A002) Agreed to by recorded vote: 308 - 107 (Roll no. 90).
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1865.
- The House adopted the amendments en gross as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
- The House resolved into Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union for further consideration.
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- H.Amdt.527 On agreeing to the Jackson Lee amendment (A003) Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Mrs. Roby moved that the Committee rise.
- H.Amdt.525 On agreeing to the Goodlatte amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 748, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Jackson Lee amendment No. 3.
- The Speaker designated the Honorable Jeff Denham to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- Rule H. Res. 748 passed House.
- H.Amdt.527 Amendment (A003) offered by Ms. Jackson Lee. (consideration: CR H1304-1305; text: CR H1304)
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1865. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1865 under a structured rule with one hour of debate equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Member of the Committee on the Judiciary. The rule makes in order an amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on the Judiciary printed in the bill. The rule also provides one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 748 and Rule XVIII.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 748. (consideration: CR H1290-1305; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H1301)
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 1865.
- H.Amdt.525 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Goodlatte. (consideration: CR H1301-1302; text: CR H1301-1302)
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 748, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Goodlatte amendment No. 1.
- H.Amdt.526 Amendment (A002) offered by Mrs. Walters, Mimi. (consideration: CR H1302-1304, H1317-1318; text: CR H1302)
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 748, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Mrs. Mimi Walters (CA) amendment No. 2.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Mimi Walters amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Lofgren demanded a recorded vote, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until a time to be announced.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 748 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1865. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1865 under a structured rule with one hour of debate equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Member of the Committee on the Judiciary. The rule makes in order an amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on the Judiciary printed in the bill. The rule also provides one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 432.
- Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-572, Part I.
On December 12, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (8)
SA 2212
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
SA 2213
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
S.Amdt.2212
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
S.Amdt.2213
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.525
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.527
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.526
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
All Actions
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (175)
Type:
Primary Sponsor