+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On July 18, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Total Force.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On April 29, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
- Referred to House Armed Services
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor