+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Actions (44)
On August 20, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-409.
- Signed by President.
On August 10, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On August 9, 1988 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On August 4, 1988 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 3, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On August 3, 1988 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to House amendment to Senate amendment by Voice Vote.
On July 29, 1988 in the Senate:
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
On July 27, 1988 in the Senate:
- House Concurred, in Senate Amendments , with Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On June 16, 1988 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 13, 1988 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.2348 Proposed by Senator Byrd for Senator Johnston. Of a technical nature.
- Measure laid before Senate.
- S.AMDT.2348 Amendment SP 2348 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
On May 27, 1988 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 708.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 100-375.
On May 11, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On March 25, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Agriculture Department. Unfavorable.
On March 14, 1988 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 100-611.
On March 2, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Interior Department, Agriculture Department, OMB.
On February 29, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Department of the Interior. Unfavorable.
On December 16, 1987 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
On December 15, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On December 14, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 301.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 100-165 .
On December 9, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 28, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 9, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 18, 1987 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-165 .
On June 17, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Interior.
On June 3, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 19, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 10, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On April 2, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On March 30, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2348
Of a technical nature.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor