+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On December 13, 1982 in the House:
- Other Measure S.1444 Passed House in Lieu.
- Laid on Table in House by Voice Vote.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On October 5, 1982 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 583.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Armed Services. Report No: 97-910 .
On September 30, 1982 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Government Operations. Report No: 97-910 .
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 29, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On September 28, 1982 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 27, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 26, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Military Installations and Facilities.
On February 20, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Government Activities and Transportation.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD, FEMA, GSA, OMB.
On February 17, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Government Operations.
- Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor