+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On September 11, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 541.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-841 .
On July 23, 2008 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
On July 10, 2008 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
On March 30, 2007 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor