+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
On November 19, 2009 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 343 - 55 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On November 18, 2009 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1834 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Provisions of Measure Incorporated into H.R.2352 .
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Rural Development, Entrepreneurship and Trade.
- Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor