+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On October 5, 1998 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Young moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On October 2, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 436.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 105-765 .
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held.
On June 16, 1997 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from HHS.
On June 7, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor