+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On December 22, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by President.
On December 11, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 2, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6035)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 1830.
- Mr. Clay moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H6035-6036)
On November 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S6694)
- S.Amdt.2687 Amendment SA 2687 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.2687 Amendment SA 2687 proposed by Senator Cornyn for Senator Schumer. (consideration: CR S6693-6694; text: CR S6694) In the nature of a substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6693-6694)
- Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On September 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
On September 19, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7816)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1830.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7816-7818)
- Mr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 2687
In the nature of a substitute.
S.Amdt.2687
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsors (304)
Type:
Primary Sponsor