+ − Summary
+ − Actions (23)
On October 28, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Private Law No: 100-27.
- Signed by President.
On October 21, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 20, 1988 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 18, 1988 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 14, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 14, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On October 5, 1988 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1103.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 12, 1988 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Affairs. Approved for full committee consideration without amendment favorably.
On November 10, 1987 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Affairs.
On October 21, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On October 20, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Unanimous Consent.
- Called up by House on Call of Private Calendar.
On October 6, 1987 in the House:
- Placed on Private Calendar No: 23.
- Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 100-351.
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 22, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 31, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law.
On March 25, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor