+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 250.
- Committee on Agriculture discharged.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-337, Part I.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 15.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged.
- Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (109)
Type:
Primary Sponsor