+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On October 17, 2002 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On July 16, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations.
On May 22, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On May 18, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Civil Service and Agency Organization.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On May 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to House Government Reform
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor