+ − Summary
+ − Actions (24)
On November 22, 2004 in the House:
- House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 10, 2004.
On November 19, 2004 in the House:
- House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 22, 2004.
On October 1, 2004 in the House:
- House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 19, 2004.
On July 22, 2004 in the House:
- House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 1, 2004.
On June 1, 2004 in the House:
- House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than July 23, 2004.
On January 31, 2004 in the House:
- House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 1, 2004.
On November 21, 2003 in the House:
- House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Jan. 31, 2004.
On November 7, 2003 in the House:
- House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 21, 2003.
On October 31, 2003 in the House:
- House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 7, 2003.
On October 3, 2003 in the House:
- House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 31, 2003.
On September 9, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Legislative and Budget Process.
On July 25, 2003 in the House:
- House Committee on Government Reform Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than July 25, 2003.
- House Committee on Ways and Means Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than July 25, 2003.
- Committee on Government Reform discharged.
- Committee on The Budget discharged.
- Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
- House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 3, 2003.
On June 2, 2003 in the House:
- House Committee on The Budget Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than July 25, 2003.
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Efficiency and Financial Management.
On January 7, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to House Government Reform
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Rules
- Referred to House Budget
- Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, Ways and Means, and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor