+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-180.
On September 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On September 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On July 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. Without written report.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 445.
On June 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works by unanimous consent.
On November 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
On November 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On November 16, 2011 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 14, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-282 .
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 89.
- Mr. Denham moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1791 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mrs. Napolitano objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
On June 22, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor