+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On June 11, 2008 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 14, 2008 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 13, 2008 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 6, 2008 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 4, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On June 27, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities.
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Income Security and Family Support.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On March 30, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to House Education and Labor
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor