+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On October 30, 1978 in the House:
- Private Law 95-129.
- Signed by President.
On October 24, 1978 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On October 13, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On October 13, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 95-1346.
On December 7, 1977 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On December 6, 1977 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
On May 16, 1977 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, H. Rept. 95-329.
On January 12, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor