+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On October 10, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 117-187.
On October 4, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On September 30, 2022 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6052)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1762-1763)
- Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1766.
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1762)
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1762)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House