+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On July 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy .
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, Energy and Commerce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Judiciary