+ − Summary
+ − Actions (24)
On November 2, 1983 in the House:
- Clean Bill H.R.4277 Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in Lieu.
On July 29, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 28, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 27, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 25, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 21, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 14, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 13, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 12, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 15, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 8, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 25, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 21, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 20, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 19, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 14, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 12, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 7, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 24, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 23, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 22, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 16, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 9, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Fossil and Synthetic Fuels.
On March 2, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor