+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 21, 1974 in the House:
- Public law 93-529.
- Signed by President.
On December 12, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On December 10, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On December 10, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On December 4, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
On November 26, 1974 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, H. Rept. 93-1501.
On November 25, 1974 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Appropriations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor