+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On October 4, 1983 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On October 3, 1983 in the House:
- Passed House by Unanimous Consent.
- Called up by House on Call of Consent Calendar.
On September 20, 1983 in the House:
- Placed on Consent Calendar No: 19.
- Placed on House Calendar No: 97.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Public Works and Transportation. Report No: 98-364.
On August 3, 1983 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 29, 1983 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 14, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds.
On March 1, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor