+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 18, 1997 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 105-27.
- Signed by President.
On July 9, 1997 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On June 30, 1997 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 27, 1997 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On June 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On June 26, 1997 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 102.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Thompson without amendment. Without written report.
On June 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On April 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On April 16, 1997 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Horn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 11, 1997 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 16, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Information and Technology.
On January 7, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform and Oversight.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor