+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On August 5, 1997 in the House:
- See H.R.2014 .
On June 17, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Youth and Families.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity.
On June 6, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Surface Transportation.
On June 4, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
On June 3, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On May 22, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, the Judiciary, Transportation and Infrastructure, Banking and Financial Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Commerce
- Referred to House Budget
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Banking and Financial Services
On May 21, 1997 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor