+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On November 5, 1981 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From GAO.
On April 13, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From NRC.
On April 3, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from GAO.
On March 14, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from NRC.
On March 5, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy Research and Production.
On February 20, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Oceanography.
On February 18, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Natural Resources, Agricultural Research, and Environment.
On February 11, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD, DOE, EPA, NRC, Commerce, Interior, State.
On February 5, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Science and Technology.
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor