+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Star Print ordered on the bill.
On June 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On June 6, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 416 - 0 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1716 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Lipinski moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On June 5, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 105.
- Reported by the Committee on Science and Technology. H. Rept. 110-173 .
On May 23, 2007 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science and Technology.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor