+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (51)
On November 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On November 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On November 9, 1999 in the House:
- Rule H. Res. 366 passed House.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 366 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1714 with 1 hour of general debate. In lieu of the amendments recommended by the Committees on Commerce and the Judiciary now printed in the bill, it shall be in order to consider as an original bill for the purpose of amendment an amendment in the nature of a substitute printed in the Congressional Record and numbered one. The previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Specified amendments are in order.
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 366 and Rule XXIII.
- The Speaker designated the Honorable Henry Bonilla to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 1714 .
- H.AMDT.552 Amendment offered by Mr. Inslee. Amendment requires that consumers must affirmatively consent to receive electronic records; allows the consumer to retain these records and withdraw consent; and clarifies that provisions do not affect any disclosures required under regulation or law.
- DEBATE - Pursuant to H. Res. 366 , the Committee is debating the amendment offered by Mr. Inslee for thirty minutes.
- H.AMDT.552 On agreeing to the Inslee amendment Agreed to by recorded vote: 418 - 2 .
- H.AMDT.553 Amendment in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Dingell. Amendment in the nature of a substitute sought to recognize the validity of electronic signatures and records in commercial transactions.
- DEBATE - Pursuant to H. Res. 366 , the Committee is debating the amendment in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Dingell for thirty minutes.
- H.AMDT.553 On agreeing to the Dingell amendment Failed by recorded vote: 126 - 278 .
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1714 .
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair put the question on passage by voice vote and announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. LaFalce demanded a recorded vote. Pursuant to H. Res. 366 , further proceedings were postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On passage Passed by recorded vote: 356 - 66 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 8, 1999 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 366 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1714 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Specified amendments are in order.
On November 1, 1999 in the House:
- Mr. Bliley moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1714 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: : 234 - 122 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On October 15, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 222.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 106-341 , Part II.
On October 13, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 7, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 30, 1999 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On September 27, 1999 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Commerce. H. Rept. 106-341 , Part I.
- Referred sequentially to the House Committee on the Judiciary for a period ending not later than Oct. 15, 1999 for consideration of such provisions of the bill and amendment as fall within the jurisdiction of that committee pursuant to clause 1, rule x.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts and Intellectual Property.
On August 5, 1999 in the House:
- Ms. Pryce asked unanimous consent that the Committee on Commerce have until midnight on Sept. 7 to file a report on H.R. 1714 . Agreed to without objection.
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 29, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 21, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 24, 1999 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 9, 1999 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 25, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Finance and Hazardous Materials.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection.
On May 6, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Commerce.
+ − Amendments (2)
H.AMDT.552
Amendment requires that consumers must affirmatively consent to receive electronic records; allows the consumer to retain these records and withdraw consent; and clarifies that provisions do not affect any disclosures required under regulation or law.
H.AMDT.553
Amendment in the nature of a substitute sought to recognize the validity of electronic signatures and records in commercial transactions.
+ − Votes (3)
November 9, 1999: On Agreeing to the Amendment
- Yeas: 418
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 13
November 9, 1999: On Agreeing to the Amendment
- Yeas: 126
- Nays: 278
- Absent: 29
November 9, 1999: On Passage
- Yeas: 356
- Nays: 66
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor