+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On May 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Organization, Efficiency, and Financial Management .
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
- Referred to House Armed Services
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor