+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 16, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 113-208.
On December 10, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6395-6396)
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5374-5375)
- Mr. Meadows moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5374)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1707.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor