+ − Summary
+ − Actions (20)
On May 24, 1983 in the House:
- Other Measure S.967 Passed House in Lieu.
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 372 - 48 .
- Laid on Table in House by Voice Vote.
On May 23, 1983 in the House:
- Considered by House Unifinished Business Vote Postponed Until May 24, 1983.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On May 17, 1983 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 128.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Energy and Commerce. Report No: 98-154 .
On May 16, 1983 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Public Works and Transportation. Report No: 98-154 .
On May 12, 1983 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 11, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Aviation Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 10, 1983 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 16, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 14, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Aviation.
On March 7, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Commerce, Transportation and Tourism.
On February 28, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor