+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to section 8 of H. Res. 473, and the motion offered by Mr. McGovern, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 293; H.R. 587; H.R. 610, as amended; H.R. 1144, as amended; H.R. 1703, as amended; H.R. 1921; H.R. 2008; H.R. 2332, as amended; H.R. 2545; and H.R. 3642, as amended. (consideration: CR H2792-2799; text: CR H2796-2797)
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: Pursuant to section 8 of H. Res. 473, and the motion offered by Mr. McGovern, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 293; H.R. 587; H.R. 610, as amended; H.R. 1144, as amended; H.R. 1703, as amended; H.R. 1921; H.R. 2008; H.R. 2332, as amended; H.R. 2545; and H.R. 3642, as amended.(consideration: CR H2792-2799; text: CR H2796-2797)
- Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 473, proceedings on H.R. 1703 are considered vacated.
- At the conclusion of debate, a recorded vote was demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1703.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2758-2759; text: CR H2758)
- Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 17.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-32.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E216)
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor