+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On September 21, 2020 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4567)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1702.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4567-4568)
- Ms. Haaland moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 8, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 392.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-490.
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
On December 4, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor