+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 446.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer with amendments. With written report No. 111-217 .
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On October 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On October 14, 2009 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1700 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Ms. Hirono moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On October 8, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 165.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-295 .
On September 24, 2009 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor