+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 28, 2001 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 107-11.
- Signed by President.
On May 23, 2001 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On May 22, 2001 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On May 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 1696 .
- Mr. Stump moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
On May 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.745 Amendment SA 745 proposed by Senator Warner for Senator Stevens. To provide a complete substitute.
- S.AMDT.745 Amendment SA 745 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On May 15, 2001 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 400 - 15 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1696 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Stump moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On May 4, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands.
On May 3, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
- Referred to House Resources
- Referred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.745
To provide a complete substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor