+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 22, 1998 in the House:
- Laid on the table. See S. 1260 for further action.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 340 - 83, 1 Present .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 21, 1998 in the House:
- Mr. Bliley moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Reported by the Committee on Commerce. H. Rept. 105-640 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 361.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
On June 24, 1998 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 10, 1998 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 4.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 19, 1998 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 29, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Finance and Hazardous Materials.
On May 21, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor