+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On April 17, 1986 in the House:
- For Further Action See S.720 .
On April 10, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 7, 1985 in the House:
- Favorable Executive Comment Received From Interior.
On September 26, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 26, 1985 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On April 23, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Recreation.
On March 21, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor