+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On July 19, 2011 in the House:
- Supplemental report filed by the Committee on Financial Services, H. Rept. 112-93 , Part II.
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 51.
- Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 112-93 .
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 26.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 8 .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit.
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Hearings Held Prior to Introduction.
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Introduction and Referral.
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor