+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 14, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 307.
- Committee on National Security discharged.
On April 25, 1996 in the House:
- House Committee on National Security Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 14, 1996.
- Reported by the Committee on Commerce. H. Rept. 104-540 , Part I.
On March 13, 1996 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 28, 1995 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 21, 1995 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 12, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Installations and Facilities.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOE.
On May 26, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
On May 17, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to House National Security
- Referred to House Commerce
- Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on National Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor