+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 22, 2021 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 117-27.
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 117-27.
On July 21, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to President.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 2121 proposed by Senator Durbin for Senator Toomey. (consideration: CR S4962-4965, S4967-4974; text: CR S4962) To ensure adequate funding in the Crime Victims Fund is disbursed to victims, their families, and their advocates each year.
- Senate amendment proposed (on the floor): Amendment SA 2121 proposed by Senator Durbin for Senator Toomey.
- Senate amendment not agreed to: Amendment SA 2121, as modified, not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 40 - 60. Record Vote Number: 271.
- Roll call votes on amendments in Senate: Amendment SA 2121, as modified, not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 40 - 60. Record Vote Number: 271.
- Amendment SA 2121, as modified, not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 40 - 60. Record Vote Number: 271.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4962-4965, S4967-4974)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate, under the order of 7/14/21, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 100 - 0. Record Vote Number: 272.
- Passed Senate, under the order of 7/14/21, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 100 - 0. Record Vote Number: 272.
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate amendment submitted
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 384 - 38 (Roll no. 89). (text: 3/16/2021 CR H1390-1391)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 384 - 38 (Roll no. 89).(text: 3/16/2021 CR H1390-1391)
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1481-1482)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1652.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1390-1393)
- Mr. Nadler moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 2121
To ensure adequate funding in the Crime Victims Fund is disbursed to victims, their families, and their advocates each year.
S.Amdt.2121
To ensure adequate funding in the Crime Victims Fund is disbursed to victims, their families, and their advocates each year.
+ − Votes (2)
July 20, 2021: On the Amendment S.Amdt. 2121 to H.R. 1652 (VOCA Fix to Sustain the Crime Victims Fund Act of 2021)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 60
Details:
+
−
- Sherrod Brown: nay
- Maria Cantwell: nay
- Benjamin L. Cardin: nay
- Thomas R. Carper: nay
- Robert P. Casey Jr.: nay
- Dianne Feinstein: nay
- Amy Klobuchar: nay
- Robert Menendez: nay
- Bernard Sanders: nay
- Debbie Stabenow: nay
- Jon Tester: nay
- Sheldon Whitehouse: nay
- John Barrasso: yea
- Roger F. Wicker: yea
- Susan M. Collins: nay
- John Cornyn: yea
- Richard J. Durbin: nay
- Lindsey Graham: nay
- James M. Inhofe: yea
- Mitch McConnell: yea
- Jeff Merkley: nay
- Jack Reed: nay
- James E. Risch: yea
- Jeanne Shaheen: nay
- Mark R. Warner: nay
- Kirsten E. Gillibrand: nay
- Christopher A. Coons: nay
- Joe Manchin III: nay
- Tammy Baldwin: nay
- Michael F. Bennet: nay
- Marsha Blackburn: yea
- Richard Blumenthal: nay
- Roy Blunt: nay
- John Boozman: yea
- Richard Burr: yea
- Shelley Moore Capito: nay
- Bill Cassidy: yea
- Mike Crapo: yea
- Chuck Grassley: yea
- Martin Heinrich: nay
- Mazie K. Hirono: nay
- John Hoeven: nay
- Ron Johnson: yea
- James Lankford: yea
- Patrick J. Leahy: nay
- Mike Lee: yea
- Ben Ray Lujan: nay
- Cynthia M. Lummis: yea
- Edward J. Markey: nay
- Jerry Moran: nay
- Lisa Murkowski: nay
- Christopher Murphy: nay
- Patty Murray: nay
- Rand Paul: yea
- Gary C. Peters: nay
- Rob Portman: yea
- Marco Rubio: yea
- Charles E. Schumer: nay
- Tim Scott: yea
- Richard C. Shelby: nay
- John Thune: yea
- Patrick Toomey: yea
- Chris Van Hollen: nay
- Ron Wyden: nay
- Todd Young: yea
- Brian Schatz: nay
- Tom Cotton: yea
- Kyrsten Sinema: nay
- Tammy Duckworth: nay
- Elizabeth Warren: nay
- Angus S. King Jr.: nay
- Steve Daines: yea
- Kevin Cramer: yea
- Deb Fischer: nay
- Ted Cruz: yea
- Tim Kaine: nay
- Cory A. Booker: nay
- Joni Ernst: yea
- Mike Rounds: yea
- Ben Sasse: yea
- Dan Sullivan: yea
- Thom Tillis: yea
- Catherine Cortez Masto: nay
- Margaret Wood Hassan: nay
- John Kennedy: yea
- Roger Marshall: yea
- Jacky Rosen: nay
- Tina Smith: nay
- Cindy Hyde-Smith: nay
- Mike Braun: yea
- Josh Hawley: yea
- Mitt Romney: yea
- Rick Scott: yea
- Bill Hagerty: yea
- John W. Hickenlooper: nay
- Mark Kelly: nay
- Tommy Tuberville: yea
- Jon Ossoff: nay
- Alex Padilla: nay
- Raphael G. Warnock: nay
July 20, 2021: On Passage of the Bill H.R. 1652
- Yeas: 100
Details:
+
−
- Sherrod Brown: yea
- Maria Cantwell: yea
- Benjamin L. Cardin: yea
- Thomas R. Carper: yea
- Robert P. Casey Jr.: yea
- Dianne Feinstein: yea
- Amy Klobuchar: yea
- Robert Menendez: yea
- Bernard Sanders: yea
- Debbie Stabenow: yea
- Jon Tester: yea
- Sheldon Whitehouse: yea
- John Barrasso: yea
- Roger F. Wicker: yea
- Susan M. Collins: yea
- John Cornyn: yea
- Richard J. Durbin: yea
- Lindsey Graham: yea
- James M. Inhofe: yea
- Mitch McConnell: yea
- Jeff Merkley: yea
- Jack Reed: yea
- James E. Risch: yea
- Jeanne Shaheen: yea
- Mark R. Warner: yea
- Kirsten E. Gillibrand: yea
- Christopher A. Coons: yea
- Joe Manchin III: yea
- Tammy Baldwin: yea
- Michael F. Bennet: yea
- Marsha Blackburn: yea
- Richard Blumenthal: yea
- Roy Blunt: yea
- John Boozman: yea
- Richard Burr: yea
- Shelley Moore Capito: yea
- Bill Cassidy: yea
- Mike Crapo: yea
- Chuck Grassley: yea
- Martin Heinrich: yea
- Mazie K. Hirono: yea
- John Hoeven: yea
- Ron Johnson: yea
- James Lankford: yea
- Patrick J. Leahy: yea
- Mike Lee: yea
- Ben Ray Lujan: yea
- Cynthia M. Lummis: yea
- Edward J. Markey: yea
- Jerry Moran: yea
- Lisa Murkowski: yea
- Christopher Murphy: yea
- Patty Murray: yea
- Rand Paul: yea
- Gary C. Peters: yea
- Rob Portman: yea
- Marco Rubio: yea
- Charles E. Schumer: yea
- Tim Scott: yea
- Richard C. Shelby: yea
- John Thune: yea
- Patrick Toomey: yea
- Chris Van Hollen: yea
- Ron Wyden: yea
- Todd Young: yea
- Brian Schatz: yea
- Tom Cotton: yea
- Kyrsten Sinema: yea
- Tammy Duckworth: yea
- Elizabeth Warren: yea
- Angus S. King Jr.: yea
- Steve Daines: yea
- Kevin Cramer: yea
- Deb Fischer: yea
- Ted Cruz: yea
- Tim Kaine: yea
- Cory A. Booker: yea
- Joni Ernst: yea
- Mike Rounds: yea
- Ben Sasse: yea
- Dan Sullivan: yea
- Thom Tillis: yea
- Catherine Cortez Masto: yea
- Margaret Wood Hassan: yea
- John Kennedy: yea
- Roger Marshall: yea
- Jacky Rosen: yea
- Tina Smith: yea
- Cindy Hyde-Smith: yea
- Mike Braun: yea
- Josh Hawley: yea
- Mitt Romney: yea
- Rick Scott: yea
- Bill Hagerty: yea
- John W. Hickenlooper: yea
- Mark Kelly: yea
- Tommy Tuberville: yea
- Jon Ossoff: yea
- Alex Padilla: yea
- Raphael G. Warnock: yea
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor