+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (36)
On November 7, 2000 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-450.
- Signed by President.
On October 27, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 26, 2000 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 25, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to House amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
On September 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- House agreed to Senate amendment with an amendment pursuant to H. Res. 579 .
On July 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 1651 .
- Mr. Saxton moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Failed by the Yeas and Nays: : 265 - 154 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.3621 Amendment SA 3621 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.3621 Amendment SA 3621 proposed by Senator Thomas for Senator Snowe. To strike the 40 percent SBA set-aside for the fish research vessel procurement.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. )
On May 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 569.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain with an amendment. With written report No. 106-302 .
On April 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On September 14, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On September 13, 1999 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1651 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Saxton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On June 23, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 112.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-197 .
On June 9, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 6, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 5, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
On April 29, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3621
To strike the 40 percent SBA set-aside for the fish research vessel procurement.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor