+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On April 25, 1983 in the House:
- For Further Action See H.R.2717 .
- Clean Bill H.R.2717 Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in Lieu.
On April 21, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 31, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from OMB, OPM.
On March 16, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 14, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Human Resources.
On March 1, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations.
On February 24, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor