+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On September 21, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4627-4629)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1646.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4627-4630)
- Mrs. Dingell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 419.
- Committee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-519, Part I.
On July 15, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (90)
Type:
Primary Sponsor